|
10/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 609, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 3295.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2359.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1787.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|