California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 10, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013