LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB217
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB217
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB217
Compare Versions
AB217 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB217 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB217 Amended September 6, 2013
AB217 Amended September 3, 2013
AB217 Amended July 10, 2013
AB217 Amended June 25, 2013
AB217 Amended April 16, 2013
AB217 Amended April 1, 2013
AB217 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB217 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB217 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB217 Amended September 6, 2013
AB217 Amended September 3, 2013
AB217 Amended July 10, 2013
AB217 Amended June 25, 2013
AB217 Amended April 16, 2013
AB217 Amended April 1, 2013
AB217 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare