|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6570.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4864.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5097.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4737.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4737.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|