LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2222
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2222
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2222
Compare Versions
AB2222 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB2222 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2222 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2222 Amended June 26, 2014
AB2222 Amended June 17, 2014
AB2222 Amended May 5, 2014
AB2222 Amended April 22, 2014
AB2222 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2222 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2222 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB2222 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2222 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2222 Amended June 26, 2014
AB2222 Amended June 17, 2014
AB2222 Amended May 5, 2014
AB2222 Amended April 22, 2014
AB2222 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2222 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare