California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014