|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 6623.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6444.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4822.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1329.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|