LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB225
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB225
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB225
Compare Versions
AB225 Chaptered September 20, 2014
AB225 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB225 Amended August 20, 2014
AB225 Amended August 6, 2014
AB225 Amended July 2, 2014
AB225 Amended June 18, 2014
AB225 Amended May 9, 2013
AB225 Amended April 18, 2013
AB225 Amended April 9, 2013
AB225 Amended April 1, 2013
AB225 Introduced February 4, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB225 Chaptered September 20, 2014
AB225 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB225 Amended August 20, 2014
AB225 Amended August 6, 2014
AB225 Amended July 2, 2014
AB225 Amended June 18, 2014
AB225 Amended May 9, 2013
AB225 Amended April 18, 2013
AB225 Amended April 9, 2013
AB225 Amended April 1, 2013
AB225 Introduced February 4, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare