California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill August 6, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 9, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013