|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3296.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2355.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1737.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|