California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013