LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB241
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB241
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB241
Compare Versions
AB241 Chaptered September 26, 2013
AB241 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB241 Amended September 6, 2013
AB241 Amended September 3, 2013
AB241 Amended July 1, 2013
AB241 Amended May 24, 2013
AB241 Amended March 19, 2013
AB241 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB241 Chaptered September 26, 2013
AB241 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB241 Amended September 6, 2013
AB241 Amended September 3, 2013
AB241 Amended July 1, 2013
AB241 Amended May 24, 2013
AB241 Amended March 19, 2013
AB241 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare