|
09/30/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3074.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2257.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1984.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1576.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|