California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill March 6, 2013