LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB253
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB253
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB253
Compare Versions
AB253 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB253 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB253 Amended September 4, 2013
AB253 Amended June 25, 2013
AB253 Amended May 2, 2013
AB253 Amended April 24, 2013
AB253 Amended March 6, 2013
AB253 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB253 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB253 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB253 Amended September 4, 2013
AB253 Amended June 25, 2013
AB253 Amended May 2, 2013
AB253 Amended April 24, 2013
AB253 Amended March 6, 2013
AB253 Introduced February 6, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare