|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2176.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 1474.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|