LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB256
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB256
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB256
Compare Versions
AB256 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB256 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB256 Amended May 14, 2013
AB256 Amended April 8, 2013
AB256 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB256 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB256 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB256 Amended May 14, 2013
AB256 Amended April 8, 2013
AB256 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare