California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill May 14, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013