|
10/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 610, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2917.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2105.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|