California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013