LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB270
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB270
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB270
Compare Versions
AB270 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB270 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB270 Amended August 22, 2013
AB270 Amended June 25, 2013
AB270 Amended April 16, 2013
AB270 Amended April 1, 2013
AB270 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB270 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB270 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB270 Amended August 22, 2013
AB270 Amended June 25, 2013
AB270 Amended April 16, 2013
AB270 Amended April 1, 2013
AB270 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare