|
09/23/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2094.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1563.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|