California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013