LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB329
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB329
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB329
Compare Versions
AB329 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB329 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB329 Amended May 7, 2013
AB329 Amended April 25, 2013
AB329 Amended April 18, 2013
AB329 Amended March 21, 2013
AB329 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB329 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB329 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB329 Amended May 7, 2013
AB329 Amended April 25, 2013
AB329 Amended April 18, 2013
AB329 Amended March 21, 2013
AB329 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare