|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4880.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 1877.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1720.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|