LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB336
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB336
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB336
Compare Versions
AB336 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB336 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB336 Amended May 29, 2013
AB336 Amended May 8, 2013
AB336 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB336 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB336 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB336 Amended May 29, 2013
AB336 Amended May 8, 2013
AB336 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare