California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill May 29, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013