Assembly | 01/23/2014 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Salas. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Salas. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2013 | Read first time. To print. |