LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB371
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB371
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB371
Compare Versions
AB371 Amended August 21, 2014
AB371 Amended August 19, 2014
AB371 Amended June 23, 2014
AB371 Amended June 4, 2014
AB371 Amended January 30, 2014
AB371 Amended January 27, 2014
AB371 Amended March 19, 2013
AB371 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB371 Amended August 21, 2014
AB371 Amended August 19, 2014
AB371 Amended June 23, 2014
AB371 Amended June 4, 2014
AB371 Amended January 30, 2014
AB371 Amended January 27, 2014
AB371 Amended March 19, 2013
AB371 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare