California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 23, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill January 30, 2014
Bill January 27, 2014
Bill March 19, 2013