Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 1714.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|