LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB39
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB39
Compare Versions
AB39 Amended August 20, 2014
AB39 Amended June 24, 2013
AB39 Amended May 24, 2013
AB39 Amended May 8, 2013
AB39 Amended April 24, 2013
AB39 Amended April 9, 2013
AB39 Amended February 27, 2013
AB39 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB39 Amended August 20, 2014
AB39 Amended June 24, 2013
AB39 Amended May 24, 2013
AB39 Amended May 8, 2013
AB39 Amended April 24, 2013
AB39 Amended April 9, 2013
AB39 Amended February 27, 2013
AB39 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare