California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB39 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013
Bill February 27, 2013