Assembly | 05/01/2013 | In committee: Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | Read first time. To print. |