California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2013

Amended

Bill May 20, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill March 13, 2013