LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB424
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB424
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB424
Compare Versions
AB424 Chaptered October 2, 2013
AB424 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB424 Amended May 20, 2013
AB424 Amended April 23, 2013
AB424 Amended March 13, 2013
AB424 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB424 Chaptered October 2, 2013
AB424 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB424 Amended May 20, 2013
AB424 Amended April 23, 2013
AB424 Amended March 13, 2013
AB424 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare