|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 3196.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2313.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1730.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/21/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/20/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|