LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB48
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB48
Compare Versions
AB48 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB48 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB48 Amended September 6, 2013
AB48 Amended August 12, 2013
AB48 Amended July 9, 2013
AB48 Amended June 24, 2013
AB48 Amended May 24, 2013
AB48 Amended May 7, 2013
AB48 Amended April 4, 2013
AB48 Amended February 4, 2013
AB48 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB48 Chaptered October 11, 2013
AB48 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB48 Amended September 6, 2013
AB48 Amended August 12, 2013
AB48 Amended July 9, 2013
AB48 Amended June 24, 2013
AB48 Amended May 24, 2013
AB48 Amended May 7, 2013
AB48 Amended April 4, 2013
AB48 Amended February 4, 2013
AB48 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare