California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill July 9, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013
Bill February 4, 2013