Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4931.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4894.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Jackson. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4909.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1786.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/21/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|