California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013