LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB49
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB49
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB49
Compare Versions
AB49 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB49 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB49 Amended August 22, 2014
AB49 Amended August 19, 2013
AB49 Amended July 1, 2013
AB49 Amended April 18, 2013
AB49 Amended April 8, 2013
AB49 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB49 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB49 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB49 Amended August 22, 2014
AB49 Amended August 19, 2013
AB49 Amended July 1, 2013
AB49 Amended April 18, 2013
AB49 Amended April 8, 2013
AB49 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare