California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Amended

Bill September 5, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 15, 2013
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill May 1, 2013