California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB50 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/16/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 50ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 5, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Pan DECEMBER 21, 2012 An act to add Section 14005.22 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 50, Pan. Health care coverage: Medi-Cal: eligibility. Existing law provides for the Medi-Cal program, which is administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which qualified low-income individuals receive health care services. The Medi-Cal program is, in part, governed and funded by federal Medicaid Program provisions. This bill would, effective January 1, 2014, and under specified federal provisions applicable to qualified pregnant women and children, provide that a woman shall be eligible for full-scope Medi-Cal benefits if her income is less than 100% of the federal poverty level as determined, counted, and valued in accordance with federal law. The bill would require the department to adopt regulations implementing that provision by January 1, 2017, and to provide semiannual status reports to the Legislature until that time. Because counties are required to make Medi-Cal eligibility determinations and this bill would expand Medi-Cal eligibility, the bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14005.22 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 14005.22. (a) Effective January 1, 2014, a woman shall be eligible for full-scope Medi-Cal benefits under Section 1396a(a)(10) (A)(i)(III) of Title 42 of the United States Code if her income is less than 100 percent of the federal poverty level as determined, counted, and valued in accordance with the requirements of Section 1396a(e)(14) of Title 42 of the United States Code, as added by the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Public Law 111-148) and as amended by the federal Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Public Law 111-152) and any subsequent amendments, and she meets all other eligibility requirements. (b) Notwithstanding Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, the department, without taking any further regulatory action, shall implement, interpret, or make specific this section by means of all-county letters, plan letters, plan or provider bulletins, or similar instructions until the time regulations are adopted. The department shall adopt regulations by January 1, 2017, in accordance with the requirements of Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code. Beginning six months after the effective date of this section, notwithstanding Section 10321.5 of the Government Code, the department shall provide a status report to the Legislature on a semiannual basis, in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code, until regulations have been adopted. (c) This section shall be implemented only if and to the extent that federal financial participation is available and any necessary federal approvals have been obtained. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.