LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB50
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB50
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB50
Compare Versions
AB50 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB50 Amended September 5, 2013
AB50 Amended September 3, 2013
AB50 Amended August 15, 2013
AB50 Amended May 13, 2013
AB50 Amended May 1, 2013
AB50 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB50 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB50 Amended September 5, 2013
AB50 Amended September 3, 2013
AB50 Amended August 15, 2013
AB50 Amended May 13, 2013
AB50 Amended May 1, 2013
AB50 Introduced December 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare