|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 133, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2466.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 1696.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|