California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill June 18, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013