LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB541
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB541
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB541
Compare Versions
AB541 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB541 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB541 Amended June 18, 2013
AB541 Amended April 22, 2013
AB541 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB541 Chaptered August 26, 2013
AB541 Enrolled August 13, 2013
AB541 Amended June 18, 2013
AB541 Amended April 22, 2013
AB541 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare