|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6038.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4418.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3727.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|