LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB569
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB569
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB569
Compare Versions
AB569 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB569 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB569 Amended July 1, 2014
AB569 Amended June 2, 2014
AB569 Amended September 12, 2013
AB569 Amended March 18, 2013
AB569 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB569 Chaptered September 27, 2014
AB569 Enrolled August 15, 2014
AB569 Amended July 1, 2014
AB569 Amended June 2, 2014
AB569 Amended September 12, 2013
AB569 Amended March 18, 2013
AB569 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare